+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0001
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Effective Date April 2, 2021
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-007-001
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 011-005-001
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to Executive
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- Referred to Assignments
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-041-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Ethics & Elections Committee; 010-007-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 10 ILCS 5/1A-55 -
- 10 ILCS 5/17-13 - from Ch. 46, par. 17-13
- 10 ILCS 5/19-6 - from Ch. 46, par. 19-6
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2021: HB1871 - Third Reading
March 24, 2021: HB1871 - Executive
March 18, 2021: HB1871 - Third Reading
March 15, 2021: HB1871 - Ethics & Elections Committee
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor