+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 235/10 new