+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0548
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 19, 2003
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Angelo Saviano; Motion #1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-010-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Executive; 012-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 010-001-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the original text provisions concerning the Animal Control Act. Further amends the Animal Control Act. Changes the definitions of "administrator", "cat", "deputy administrator", "dangerous dog", "enclosure", "vicious dog", and "impounded". Authorizes the Board to require the microchipping of dogs and cats. Adds the exercise of dog and cat overpopulation control to the list of duties of the Administrator. Provides that no owner of a vicious dog shall give the dog away without court approval. Makes it unlawful for a person to permit a dangerous dog to leave the premises of its owner when not under control by leash or other recognized control methods. Provides that the county board shall establish a schedule of damages based on current market value for livestock, poultry, or equidae injured or killed by another person's dog. Deletes the language concerning the value of livestock. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 6
Deletes everything. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1 with these changes. Adds impairment of plastic surgery to the definition of "serious physical injury". Provides that if the county board requires microchipping, the microchip number shall be the animal control registration number. Limits cost of microchipping to $15. Deletes provision requiring microchipping at intervals determined by regulations under the Animal Control Act. Requires the Administrator to give 7 business days (instead of 10 days) notice to the owner before disposing of an impounded animal, and provides that the 7 business day requirement does not apply to a facility that is open 7 days a week for animal reclamation. Requires a person with knowledge of another being bitten by an animal bite to report that fact to the administrator (instead of should report). Adds definitions of "business day" and "feral cat" to the Animal Control Act. Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 6
Deletes everything. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1 with these changes. Adds impairment of plastic surgery to the definition of "serious physical injury". Provides that if the county board requires microchipping, the microchip number shall be the animal control registration number. Limits cost of microchipping to $15. Deletes provision requiring microchipping at intervals determined by regulations under the Animal Control Act. Requires the Administrator to give 7 business days (instead of 10 days) notice to the owner before disposing of an impounded animal, and provides that the 7 business day requirement does not apply to a facility that is open 7 days a week for animal reclamation. Requires a person with knowledge of another being bitten by an animal bite to report that fact to the administrator (instead of should report). Adds definitions of "business day" and "feral cat" to the Animal Control Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 510 ILCS 5/15 - from Ch. 8, par. 365
- 510 ILCS 5/26 - from Ch. 8, par. 376