+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-002-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-10-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-10-2
+ − Vote
March 16, 2021: HB0184 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor