+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 80/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 1901
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: HB1820 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor