+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-8-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-8-7