+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-041-005
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 405 ILCS 35/5 - from Ch. 91 1/2, par. 1105
+ − Vote
April 3, 2003: HB1817 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor