+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0035
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-4
- 730 ILCS 5/5-7-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-7-2
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2007: HB0181 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
March 7, 2007: HB0181 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 07, 2007
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor