+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0359
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill, except provides that when the Department of State Police provides digital or electronic forensic examination assistance, or both, (rather than assistance) to another law enforcement agency which investigated the case that gave rise to the conviction of the defendant for child pornography, $100 of the additional fine shall be remitted by the circuit clerk within one month after receipt to the State Treasurer for deposit into the State Crime Laboratory Fund.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the additional child pornography fines shall be remitted to the Department of State Police instead of the State Treasurer.