+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0868
- Effective Date July 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2009
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 28, 2009
- Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2009
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William D. Burns
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Removes the allocation formula for the use of the Community Mental Health Medicaid Trust Fund and provides that 100% of the Fund shall be used for the purchase of community mental health services. Specifies caps on the Community Mental Health Medicaid Trust Fund's use for administration and oversight of community mental health services. Removes the reallocation of the first $16,700,000 from the Community Developmental Disability Services Medicaid Trust Fund. Requires the Department of Human Services to annually report to the Governor and the General Assembly upon total deposits into and expenditures from those funds. Effective July 1, 2012.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5B-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5B-2