+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-038-000
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-17a - from Ch. 122, par. 10-17a
- 105 ILCS 5/27-12 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-12