+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/101 - from Ch. 120, par. 1-101
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor