+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 55 ILCS 5/3-4006 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-4006
- 225 ILCS 60/22 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-22
- 225 ILCS 60/23 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-23
- 410 ILCS 210/1.5
- 750 ILCS 70/Act rep.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor