+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 500/25-210 new
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor