+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- Recommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 005-000-000
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Increases the penalty for aggravated battery of an unborn child from a Class 2 felony to a Class X felony for which the person shall be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 6 years and not more than 45 years.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB0179 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor