+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 1, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 022-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes the provisions concerning the payment of State aid claims.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes the provisions concerning the payment of State aid claims.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 1A-8
- 105 ILCS 5/18-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 18-11
+ − Vote
April 25, 2007: HB1784 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 25, 2007
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor