+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Civil Law
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 17, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-015-002
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
May 15, 2007: HB1747 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor