+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.