+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Excludes, from language providing for an increase in Medicaid rates for nursing homes, a facility licensed by the Department of Public Health under the Nursing Home Care Act as an Intermediate Care Facility for the Developmentally Disabled.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor