+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 27, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date February 23, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0586
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-012-004
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2021
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Agriculture; 012-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-024-002
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-001-000
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that "offer for sale" means to sell, exchange for consideration, offer for adoption, advertise for the sale of, barter, auction, give away, or otherwise dispose of animals (rather than to display, sell, exchange for consideration, offer for adoption, advertise for the sale of, barter, auction, give away, or otherwise dispose of animals). Provides that provisions concerning the prohibition of dogs and cats sold by pet shops shall not prohibit a pet shop operator from providing space to an animal control facility or animal shelter to showcase dogs or cats owned by these entities for the purpose of adoption.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 225 ILCS 605/2 - from Ch. 8, par. 302
- 225 ILCS 605/3.8
- 225 ILCS 605/3.9 new
- 225 ILCS 605/3.15
- 225 ILCS 605/20 - from Ch. 8, par. 320
- 225 ILCS 605/20.5
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2021: HB1711 - Third Reading
May 27, 2021: HB1711 - Agriculture
April 14, 2021: HB1711 - Third Reading
March 15, 2021: HB1711 - Consumer Protection
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor