+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0114
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: HB0168
May 4, 2021: HB0168 - Criminal Law
April 16, 2021: HB0168
April 16, 2021: HB0168 - Third Reading
March 9, 2021: HB0168 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor