+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-006-000
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -