+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0034
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2007
- Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 27, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes language providing that the Secretary shall issue the special plates to each surviving sibling of the deceased person. Restores language providing that the Secretary shall issue the special plates to only one surviving sibling, and only in the absence of a surviving parent.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/3-664 - was 625 ILCS 5/3-806.4
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2007: HB0167 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
March 28, 2007: HB0167 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor