+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 012-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson