+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 25, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0626
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
On July 27, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
On June 29, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 087-000-000
On June 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell; Motion #2
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #2
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell; Motion #1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Demuzio
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 007-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 022-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code and the Board of Higher Education Act. Creates the Illinois P-20 Council to study and make recommendations concerning education at all levels to avoid fragmentation of policies, promote improved teaching and learning, and continue to cultivate and demonstrate strong accountability and efficiency. Includes provisions concerning membership, funding, staffing, duties, and working groups. Abolishes the Joint Education Committee on the effective date of the amendatory Act; makes related changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 1A-4
- 110 ILCS 205/9.10 rep. -
+ − Votes (3)
June 29, 2007: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, June 29, 2007
May 28, 2007: HB1648 - Third Reading - Monday, May 28, 2007
April 18, 2007: HB1648 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 18, 2007
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor