+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 19, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0861
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-019-000
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 009-002-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard