+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0019
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 21, 2019
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Executive; 013-004-000
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Assigned to Executive
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-050-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Celina Villanueva
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Keep Illinois Families Together Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the Act, no law enforcement agency or official may enter into or remain in an agreement with U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement under a federal delegated authority program. Provides that nothing shall preclude a law enforcement official from otherwise executing that official's duties in ensuring public safety. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (5)
May 30, 2019: HB1637 - Third Reading
May 29, 2019: HB1637 - Executive
May 27, 2019: HB1637 - Third Reading
May 15, 2019: HFA0002 - Executive
February 20, 2019: HB1637 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor