+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 4, 2003
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 5 ILCS 490/115 new -
- 20 ILCS 5/5-635 - was 20 ILCS 5/18
- 20 ILCS 3205/3 - from Ch. 17, par. 453
- 105 ILCS 5/24-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-2
- 110 ILCS 70/45a - from Ch. 24 1/2, par. 38l.1
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -