+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
On November 2, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
On September 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
On August 24, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 5, 2007
On August 17, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 24, 2007
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 17, 2007
On August 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
On July 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
On June 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 018-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Labor Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Shane Cultra
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Shane Cultra
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Shane Cultra
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 023-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Labor Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A Mendoza
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause, and re-inserts language providing that if a third party client's hours of work report that is given to a day and temporary labor service agency for a laborer includes payroll information covering more than one day in the work week, the day and temporary labor service agency may show on the paycheck stub or other approved form the combined number of hours worked for that client in the week rather than the hours worked each day.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor