+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On October 17, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0650
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 058-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 11, 2007
On October 2, 2007 in the House:
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 113-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 1, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 2, 2007
On September 10, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On July 12, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 102-000-000
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
On May 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Public Health; 006-001-001
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1, from the Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services.
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 1, 2007
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 017-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes a provision concerning cost-sharing in the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (5)
October 11, 2007: HB1628 - Motion - Thursday, October 11, 2007
October 2, 2007: HB1628 - Motion - Tuesday, October 02, 2007
June 13, 2007: SFA0002 - Concurrence - Wednesday, June 13, 2007
May 28, 2007: HB1628 - Third Reading - Monday, May 28, 2007
April 25, 2007: HB1628 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 25, 2007
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor