+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 1001
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: HB1625 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor