+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. William B. Black
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. William B. Black
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Angelo Saviano
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 65 ILCS 5/11-12-5 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-12-5
- 65 ILCS 5/11-12-6 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-12-6
- 65 ILCS 5/11-12-11 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-12-11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor