+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor