+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 570/401 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1401