+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/103-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 103-3