+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor