+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0024
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 21, 2019
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-018-000
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-004-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-035-000
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-003-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-005-001
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Tasks the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority (ICJIA), rather than the Department of Transportation, with the collection, compilation, and analysis of the traffic stop statistical study data required by the Section. Creates the Traffic and Pedestrian Stop Data Use and Collection Task Force within the ICJIA to undertake these responsibilities. Prescribes membership for the Task Force and provides that it shall report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by March 1, 2022 and every 3 years after.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2019: HB1613 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB1613 - Criminal Law
April 11, 2019: HB1613 - Third Reading
April 10, 2019: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
February 26, 2019: HB1613 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor