+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
+ − Statute Amended
- 410 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 8054
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor