+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- To Local Government Subcommittee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn