+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0590
- Effective Date September 10, 2007
- Governor Approved
On July 12, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-000-000
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 010-000-000
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 013-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Adds, as a condition for renewal of a license for 2 years, that the licensee has not admitted or retained a resident in violation of the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act's residency requirements in the preceding 24 months.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 13, 2007: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, June 13, 2007
May 22, 2007: HB1611 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1611 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor