+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor