+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0405
- Effective Date August 19, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
- Assigned to Education
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that a pupil shall be excused from engaging in any physical activity components of a physical education course (rather than from engaging in a physical education course) during a period of religious fasting.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-6
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: HB0160
May 4, 2021: HB0160 - Education
April 14, 2021: HB0160 - Third Reading
March 3, 2021: HB0160 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor