+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 006-004-000
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor