+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1147
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Effective Date December 10, 2018
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-000-000
On November 9, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
November 28, 2018: HB1594 - Third Reading
November 27, 2018: HB1594 - State Government
November 15, 2018: HB1594 - Third Reading
November 14, 2018: HFA0001 - Labor & Commerce Committee
March 29, 2017: HB1594 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor