+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
- Postponed - Revenue
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-006-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Contains provisions concerning valuation and taxation of keystone property. Provides that keystone property is property that has had a distinguished past and is a prominent property in the Village of Park Forest but is not of historical significance or landmark status and meets certain criteria. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Contains provisions concerning valuation and taxation of keystone property. Provides that keystone property is property that has had a distinguished past and is a prominent property in the Village of Park Forest but is not of historical significance or landmark status and meets certain criteria. Effective immediately.