+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 7, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0138
- Effective Date August 7, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-034-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 006-002-000
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/9-2-100 - from Ch. 24, par. 9-2-100