+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
- Session Sine Die
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed January 10, 2021
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 27, 2019
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-048-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 004
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in imposing a sentence for an offense that requires a mandatory minimum sentence of imprisonment, the court may instead sentence the offender to probation, conditional discharge, or a lesser term of imprisonment it deems appropriate if: (1) the offense involves the use or possession of drugs, retail theft, or driving on a revoked license due to unpaid financial obligations; (2) the court finds that the defendant does not pose a risk to public safety; and (3) the interest of justice requires imposing probation, conditional discharge, or a lesser term of imprisonment. Provides that the court must state on the record its reasons for imposing probation, conditional discharge, or a lesser term of imprisonment.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that in imposing a sentence for an offense that requires a mandatory minimum sentence of imprisonment or probation or conditional discharge of 2 years or more, the court may instead sentence the offender to a lesser term of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge it deems appropriate if the court finds that the defendant does not pose a risk to public safety and the interest of justice requires the non-imposition of the mandatory sentence of imprisonment or a lesser sentence of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge. Provides that an offender convicted of a sex offense, robbery offense, or a crime of violence as defined in the Crime Victims Compensation Act (rather than an offense involving the infliction of great bodily harm) may not be sentenced to a lesser term of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge under the provision.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-4-1