+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick
On January 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
- Second Reading
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Executive
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: HB0157 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: HB0157 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor