+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 109-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Jones
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Recalled to Second Reading
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On December 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-041-000
- Motion Prevailed 069-039-000
- Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 011-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reenacts the Transportation Network Providers Act. Provides for the continuation and validation of the Act, and extends the repeal to June 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Removes the provisions amending the Illinois Insurance Code and the Pharmacy Practice Act.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5 -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.33 new -
- 225 ILCS 85/16d new -
- 225 ILCS 85/19.5 -
- 225 ILCS 85/19.7 new -
- 225 ILCS 85/25 - from Ch. 111, par. 4145
- 225 ILCS 85/41 -
- 625 ILCS 57/33 new -
- 625 ILCS 57/Act title -
- 625 ILCS 57/1 -
- 625 ILCS 57/5 -
- 625 ILCS 57/10 -
- 625 ILCS 57/15 -
- 625 ILCS 57/20 -
- 625 ILCS 57/25 -
- 625 ILCS 57/30 -
- 625 ILCS 57/32 -
- 625 ILCS 57/34 -
+ − Votes (5)
January 12, 2021: HB0156 - Third Reading
January 12, 2021: SFA0003 - Concurrence
April 12, 2019: HB0156 - Motion
April 12, 2019: HB0156 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB0156 - Prescription Drug Affordability
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor