+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/14-119 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-119
- 40 ILCS 5/14-121 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-121